VA HJR322 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ322ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ322ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Ryland Yancey Bailey, Sr.
Title
Celebrating the life of Ryland Yancey Bailey, Sr.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] |
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Kirkland Cox [R] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ322ER) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-23 | House | Agreed to by House |
2018-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-02-21 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 18105208D |