VA HJR318 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ318ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ318ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Germanna Community College.
Title
Commending Germanna Community College.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] |
Del. Nicholas Freitas [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Sen. John McGuire [R] | Del. Robert Orrock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ318ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-02 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-25 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 20108424D |