VA HJR300 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Ashton Daniel Mitchell III.
Title
Celebrating the life of Ashton Daniel Mitchell III.
Sponsors
Del. Hyland Fowler [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-02 | House | Agreed to by House |
2020-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-21 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 20105442D |