VA HJR297 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ297ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ297ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Kiwanis Club of Danville.
Title
Commending the Kiwanis Club of Danville.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ297ER) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-07 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-02-24 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22106737D |