VA HJR291 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ291ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ291ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending William C. Shelton.
Title
Commending William C. Shelton.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ291ER) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-23 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-02-16 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 18106355D |