VA HJR29 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR29
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Board of Workforce Development; adequacy of the funding model for noncredit workforce credential programs; work group; report. Requests the Virginia Board of Workforce Development to study the current funding model for noncredit workforce credential programs offered at comprehensive community colleges in order to identify areas of inadequacy and make recommendations on options for reforming the funding model to address those inadequacies and improve the sustainability of offering and providing noncredit workforce credential programs to ensure that the Virginia Community College System as a whole is capable of continuing to meet the increasing demand for highly skilled credentialed workers in the Commonwealth.
Title
Comprehensive community colleges; funding model for noncredit workforce credential programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104274D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR29 (Carry Over) 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
SJR20 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N)
SJR20 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N)
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Community Colleges
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Workforce
Community Colleges
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Workforce
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HJ29 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HJ29+hil |