VA HJR274 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ274ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ274ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Hopewell High School football team.
Title
Commending the Hopewell High School football team.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ274ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-25 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-25 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed by until Tuesday, February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 20104576D |