VA HJR25 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Coal dust blown from moving trains; report. Requests certain railroad companies to make available to the General Assembly, at least annually, information on actions and activities likely to have an impact on coal dust blown from moving trains in the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coal dust blown from moving trains; report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (70-Y 26-N) (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2020-02-25SenateRead third time
2020-02-24SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateReported from Rules by voice vote
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-11SenateReading waived
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Agree To (70-Y 26-N)
2020-02-10HouseAgreed to by House (70-Y 26-N)
2020-02-10HousePrinted as engrossed 20101387D-E
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House as amended HJ25E
2020-02-10HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-10HouseTaken up
2020-02-07HouseReported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2019-12-30HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-12-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101387D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback