VA HJR244 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ244ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ244ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Varina High School football team.
Title
Commending the Varina High School football team.
Sponsors
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] |
Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Sen. Angelia Williams Graves [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ244ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-09 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-03-09 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed by until Wednesday, March 9, 2022 |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-17 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22104778D |