VA HJR241 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ241ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ241ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Dr. Laura Goldzung.
Title
Commending Dr. Laura Goldzung.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ241ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-01 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-03-01 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-03-01 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2022-02-21 | House | Passed by until Tuesday, March 1, 2022 |
2022-02-17 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22106524D |