VA HJR205 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ205ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ205ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Loudoun Now.
Title
Commending Loudoun Now.
Sponsors
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ205ER) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-17 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-10 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 20105528D |