VA HJR202 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-9)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ202ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-9)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ202ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia Manufacturers Association.
Title
Commending the Virginia Manufacturers Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ202ER) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-14 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-02-07 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22102715D |