VA HJR186 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ186ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ186ER)
Summary
Celebrating the life of Roy Otis Brown, Sr.
Title
Celebrating the life of Roy Otis Brown, Sr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ186ER) | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Received | |
2008-01-11 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-11 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2008-01-11 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-01-10 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 084750653 | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/08 084750653 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ186 |