VA HJR165 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the 70th anniversary of the founding of the State of Israel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the 70th anniversary of the founding of the State of Israel.

Sponsors

Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D]Del. Les Adams [R]Del. Hala Ayala [D]Del. John Bell [D]
Del. Richard Bell [R]Del. Robert Bloxom [R]Del. Jennifer Boysko [D]Del. Emily Brewer [R]
Del. David Bulova [D]Del. Betsy Carr [D]Del. Jennifer Foy [D]Del. Benjamin Cline [R]
Del. Mark Cole [R]Del. Christopher Collins [R]Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D]Del. Glenn Davis [R]
Del. Matt Fariss [R]Del. Hyland Fowler [R]Del. Nicholas Freitas [R]Del. Todd Gilbert [R]
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D]Del. Gregory Habeeb [R]Del. Chris Head [R]Del. Gordon Helsel [R]
Del. Steve Heretick [D]Del. Charniele Herring [D]Del. Keith Hodges [R]Del. Patrick Hope [D]
Del. Timothy Hugo [R]Del. Chris Hurst [D]Del. Riley Ingram [R]Del. Matthew James [D]
Del. Jerrauld Jones [D]Del. Chris Jones [R]Del. Mark Keam [D]Del. Terry Kilgore [R]
Del. Steven Landes [R]Del. Dave LaRock [R]Del. James Leftwich [R]Del. Mark Levine [D]
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D]Del. Alfonso Lopez [D]Del. Daniel Marshall [R]Del. John McGuire [R]
Del. Delores McQuinn [D]Del. Jason Miyares [R]Del. James Morefield [R]Del. Kathleen Murphy [D]
Del. Israel O'Quinn [R]Del. Robert Orrock [R]Del. Christopher Peace [R]Del. Todd Pillion [R]
Del. Kenneth Plum [D]Del. Brenda Pogge [R]Del. Charles Poindexter [R]Del. David Reid [D]
Del. Roxann Robinson [R]Del. Debra Rodman [D]Del. Larry Rush [R]Del. Mark Sickles [D]
Del. Marcus Simon [D]Del. Christopher Stolle [R]Del. Richard Sullivan [D]Del. Robert Thomas [R]
Del. Luke Torian [D]Del. David Toscano [D]Del. Kathy Tran [D]Del. Cheryl Turpin [D]
Del. Roslyn Tyler [D]Del. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D]Del. Lee Ware [R]Del. Vivian Watts [D]
Del. Michael Webert [R]Del. Tony Wilt [R]Del. Thomas Wright [R]Del. David Yancey [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateLeft in Rules
2018-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-02-12SenateReading waived
2018-02-09HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2018-02-09HouseEngrossed by House
2018-02-02HousePassed by for the day
2018-01-29HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 18105527D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback