VA HJR153 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ153ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ153ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Richmond Free Press.
Title
Commending the Richmond Free Press.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ153ER) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-07 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-02-07 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2022-01-31 | House | Passed by until Monday, February 7, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22104485D |