VA HJR151 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ151ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ151ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the 1987 Washington Redskins replacement players.
Title
Commending the 1987 Washington Redskins replacement players.
Sponsors
Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ151ER) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reading waived |
2018-01-26 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-01-22 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 18104219D |