VA HJR148 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ148ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ148ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Indian American Heritage Month. Designates Indian American Heritage Month. Designates August, in 2020 and in each succeeding year, as Indian American Heritage Month in Virginia.
Title
Indian American Heritage Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (88-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (88-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ148ER) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 20104528D-E |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Agree To (91-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Agreed to by House (91-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HJ148E |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Agree To (88-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-06 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration (88-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-30 | House | Passed by until Thursday, February 6, 2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Rules with amendments (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104528D |