VA HJR132 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Study; Joint Subcommittee to Study the Development of a Framework for Regulated Adult-Use of Cannabis and Medical Cannabis; report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis and medical cannabis; joint subcommittee to study development of framework for regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Rules
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2020-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 20105549D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback