VA HJR132 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-05 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ132ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-05 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ132ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution; establishing a mechanism for the coordination of services for senior citizens in Virginia; report. Requests the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to establish a mechanism for the coordination of services to senior citizens in Virginia. The Secretary of Health and Human Resources must submit an executive summary and report of his progress in meeting the request of this resolution to the 2011 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Senior citizens; SHHR to establish mechanism to facilitate coordination & access to service thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ132ER) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2010-02-15 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ132H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104868D-H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Taken up | |
2010-02-11 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104868D-H1 | |
2010-02-11 | House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103635D |