VA HJR132 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ132ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ132ER)
Summary
Brain Injury Awareness Month. Designates March, in 2008 and in each succeeding year, as Brain Injury Awareness Month in Virginia in conjunction with March as National Brain Injury Awareness Month and the Governor's proclamation of the month in Virginia in 2006.
Title
Brain Injury Awareness Month; designating as March 2008, and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ132ER) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2008-01-18 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-18 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-01-18 | House: Taken up | |
2008-01-15 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087031660 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ132 |