VA HJR130 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ130ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ130ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Harrisonburg-Rockingham Chamber of Commerce.
Title
Commending the Harrisonburg-Rockingham Chamber of Commerce.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] | Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ130ER) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Received |
2016-01-15 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/13/16 16103238D |