VA HJR129 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Study; Virginia State Crime Commission; post-conviction monitoring of persons convicted of domestic violence in the Commonwealth; report. Directs the Virginia State Crime Commission to (i) determine the number of persons convicted of domestic violence, family abuse, and intimate partner abuse in the Commonwealth in the past 10 years; (ii) provide the total number of misdemeanor and felony convictions, if applicable, for each identified person convicted of a charge related to domestic violence; (iii) identify any additional terms of the sentence for each identified person, as required by the presiding judge, including probation or any other requirements, that would allow the Commonwealth to monitor the person for any length of time following the conviction; and (iv) provide recommendations for monitoring persons convicted of domestic violence, family abuse, and intimate partner abuse, including the establishment of a domestic violence registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic violence; VSCC to study post-conviction monitoring of persons convicted.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Rules
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-08HousePresented and ordered printed 20105239D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback