VA HJR122 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ122ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ122ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending James G. Ashworth, Jr.
Title
Commending James G. Ashworth, Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ122ER) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-05 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-02-01 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 24105727D |