VA HJR12 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; solar development; agriculture, forestry, and environment; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study the impact of utility-scale solar development in the Commonwealth on agriculture, forestry, and the environment.
Title
Agriculture, forestry, and environment; JLARC to study impact of utility-scale solar development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Rules |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100585D |
Subjects
Agriculture Animal Care and Food
Environment
Forests and Forestry
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Solar Energy
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Environment
Forests and Forestry
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Solar Energy
Study Commissions Committees and Reports