VA HJR11 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ11ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ11ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Workers' Compensation Commission; practice of charging premiums for bonus pay, vacations, and holidays; report. Requests the Workers' Compensation Commission to study the practice of charging workers' compensation premiums on bonus pay, vacations, and holidays. The Workers' Compensation Commission is requested to complete its meetings by December 1, 2022, and submit its findings no later than the first day of the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. Study; Workers' Compensation Commission; practice of charging premiums for bonus pay, vacations, and holidays; report. Requests the Workers' Compensation Commission to study the practice of charging workers' compensation premiums on bonus pay, vacations, and holidays. The Workers' Compensation Commission is requested to complete its meetings by December 1, 2022, and submit its findings no later than the first day of the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Workers' compensation; study practice of charging premiums for bonus pay, vacations, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ11ER) |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22107515D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ11S1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107515D-S1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substitute bill reprinted 22107515D-S1 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107515D-S1 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading waived |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (96-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-02-11 | House | Taken up |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100717D |