VA HJR1039 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ1039ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ1039ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Hawkins-Reeve VFW Post 7916.
Title
Commending Hawkins-Reeve VFW Post 7916.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ1039ER) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Received |
2017-02-21 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-02-19 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17105602D |