VA HJR102 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ102ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ102ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; continuing the Joint Subcommittee on Coastal Study; continuing the Joint Subcommittee on Coastal Flooding; report. Continues the Joint Subcommittee on Coastal Flooding for two additional years, through the 2021 interim.
Title
Coastal Flooding, Joint Subcommittee on; continued, appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (90-Y 1-N) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (90-Y 1-N) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ102ER) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (90-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (90-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ102H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107184D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Taken up |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Incorporates HJ77 (Convirs-Fowler) |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107184D-H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102497D |
Same As/Similar To
HJ77 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
SJ27 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ27ER)
SJ27 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ27ER)