VA HB999 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]


Office of Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance; Broadband Advisory Council; expiration. Extends the expiration of the Office of Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance and the Broadband Advisory Council from July 1, 2018, to July 1, 2028.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Telework Promotion & Broadband Assistance, Office of, & Broadband Advisory Council; expiration.


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-10HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-10HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-10SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-10HouseConference substitute printed 18108303D-H1
2018-03-10 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-03-08SenateSenators: McDougle, Stanley, Dance
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-08HouseDelegates: Byron, Robinson, Bagby
2018-03-08HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-08HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
2018-03-06HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107962D-S3 (0-Y 96-N)
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2018-03-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB999S3
2018-03-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Hanger agreed to 18107962D-S3
2018-03-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-02SenateFloor substitute printed 18107962D-S3 (Hanger)
2018-03-02SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18107687D-S1
2018-03-02SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18107343D-S1
2018-03-02SenateRead third time
2018-03-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107687D-S2
2018-02-28SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-19SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107343D-S1
2018-02-19SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-02HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HouseReported from Science and Technology (21-Y 1-N)
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Science and Technology
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104596D

Virginia State Sources

Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call

Bill Comments