VA HB998 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Building energy use intensity; reporting; reduction; requirements; incentives and incentive programs. Allows localities to incentivize, by ordinance, the owner or operator of a building meeting certain criteria, or an agent of such owner or operator, to report energy use intensity (EUI) information and reduce EUI. The bill allows localities to set EUI requirements for certain buildings and develop local incentive programs for increasing building energy efficiency.
Title
Building energy use intensity; reporting, reduction, requirements, incentive programs.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101691D |