VA HB998 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary delegation of parental or legal custodial powers; child-placing agency. Allows a parent or legal custodian of a minor to delegate to another person by a properly executed power of attorney any powers regarding care, custody, or property of the minor for a period not exceeding one year. The bill provides that a parent or legal custodian who is a service member, as defined in the bill, may delegate such powers for a period of longer than a year while on active duty service, but specifies that such a period is not to exceed such active duty service plus 30 days. The bill also exempts from the requirement to obtain a license as a child-placing agency a private, nonprofit organization that assists parents with the process of delegating parental or legal custodial powers of their children, including assistance with identifying appropriate placements for their children, or that provides services and resources to support parents and legal guardians to whom custody has been transferred pursuant to a temporary delegation of parental or legal custodial powers. However, such private, nonprofit organizations will be subject to background checks and must develop and implement written policies for certain services and provide staff and provider training.
Title
Parental or legal custodial powers, temporary delegation; child-placing agency.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 41-N 1-A) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 41-N 1-A) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 41-N 1-A) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N 1-A) |
2018-02-08 | House | Printed as engrossed 18104498D-E |
2018-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB998E |
2018-02-08 | House | Pending question ordered |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 8-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104498D |