VA HB996 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB996

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Parole; exception to limitation on the application of parole statutes. Provides that an incarcerated person is eligible for parole if (i) such person was sentenced by a jury prior to the date of the Supreme Court of Virginia decision in Fishback v. Commonwealth, 260 Va. 104 (June 9, 2000), in which the Court held that a jury should be instructed on the fact that parole has been abolished, for a noncapital felony committed on or after the abolition of parole went into effect (on January 1, 1995) and (ii) the jury was not instructed on the abolition of parole in the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parole; exception to limitation on the application of parole statutes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-01-31HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103367D

Same As/Similar To

HB996 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531165.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback