VA HB99 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Landlord and tenant; victims of family abuse; evidence to mitigate low credit score; damages. Allows an applicant for a lease to recover actual damages, including all amounts paid to the landlord as an application fee, application deposit, or reimbursement for any of the landlord's out-of-pocket expenses that were charged to the applicant, along with attorney fees, if the landlord does not consider evidence of the applicant's status as a victim of family abuse to mitigate any adverse effect of the otherwise qualified applicant's low credit score.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Va. Fair Housing Law; status as a victim of family abuse, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 20-N) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
2020-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 388 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-06HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB99ER)
2020-02-27HouseEnrolled
2020-02-24SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateRead third time
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (80-Y 20-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (80-Y 20-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB99H2
2020-02-10HouseSubstitute by Delegate Simon agreed to 20108069D-H2
2020-02-10HouseCommittee on General Laws substitute rejected 20107595D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-10HouseFloor substitute printed 20108069D-H2 (Simon)
2020-02-07HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-06HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-04HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107595D-H1
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2019-12-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-12-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100448D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511310(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB99&201+sum+HB99
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB99+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB99H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB99H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB99ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0388+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0047+HB0099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0074+HB0099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0236+HB0099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0896+HB0099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0195+HB0099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0846HB0099+HB0099
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0866HB0099+HB0099

Bill Comments

feedback