VA HB989 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Compensation of local jails for cost of incarceration. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall compensate local jails for the cost of incarceration of convicted felons, calculated from the date of mailing of the final order, at the rate of $12 per inmate per day for the first 60 days, at the rate of $40 per inmate per day during the period of more than 60 but not more than 90 days, and for the actual cost of incarceration as calculated in the jail report prepared annually by the Compensation Board for more than 90 days. Currently, such compensation rates are provided for in the general appropriation act.
Title
Jails, local; Department of Corrections shall compensate for cost of incarceration.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Runion [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-04 | House | Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103678D |