VA HB987 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Abstract of votes; when required to contain accounting of absentee ballots by precinct. Provides that if any precinct in a locality has more than 25 absentee ballots cast by voters assigned to it, the abstract of votes is required to contain an accounting, by precinct, of the number of absentee ballots cast by voters assigned to each precinct in the locality.
Title
Abstract of votes; when required to contain accounting of absentee ballots by precinct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Gubernatorial Appointments |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102735D |