VA HB985 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Property conveyance. Authorizes the conveyance of the former Juvenile Correctional Facility in Natural Bridge to the Department of Veterans Services.
Title
Juvenile Correctional Facility in Natural Bridge, former; property conveyance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in General Laws |
2014-02-06 | House | Continued to 2015 in General Laws by voice vote |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102764D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB985 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB985+hil |