VA HB984 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; mandated coverage for autism spectrum disorder. Requires health insurers, health care subscription plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorder in individuals from age two through age 14. Currently, such coverage is required to be provided for individuals from age two through age 10. The provision applies with respect to insurance policies, subscription contracts, and health care plans delivered, issued for delivery, reissued, or extended on or after January 1, 2017. The measure does not apply to policies, contracts, or plans issued in the individual market or the small group market.
Title
Health insurance; mandated coverage for autism spectrum disorder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102892D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB984 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB984+hil |