VA HB978 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Improper driving. Provides that a person is guilty of improper driving if he drives without (i) giving his full time and attention to the operation of the vehicle or (ii) keeping the vehicle under proper control at all times. Current law allows a court to lower a charge of reckless driving to improper driving but does not allow law enforcement to charge a person with improper driving, under the bill a traffic infraction punishable by a fine of not more than $500.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improper driving; driving without full attention to operation of vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Transportation
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104178D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462869(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback