VA HB977 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB977
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expeditious resolution of complaints relating to certain student transportation safety issues. Requires each locality and the Department of Transportation, as applicable, to expeditiously respond to and assist in the resolution of, to the maximum extent practicable, any complaint received by or on behalf of any public elementary or secondary school student relating to such student's safety on the streets, roads, sidewalks, and crosswalks surrounding school property as such student arrives to or departs from school and permits, for the purposes of complying with such requirement, any school board to enter into a memorandum of understanding with the locality or the Department, as applicable, for the establishment of a protocol or the designation of an ombudsman for the resolution of such complaints.
Title
Student transportation safety issues, certain; expeditious resolution of complaints.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104408D |
Same As/Similar To
HB977 (Carry Over) 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB977 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB977+hil |