VA HB976 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prescriptions; unapproved use. Provides that a licensed health care provider with prescriptive authority may prescribe, administer, or dispense a drug that has been approved for a specific use by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration for an unapproved use when the health care provider determines, in his professional judgement, that such unapproved use is appropriate for the care and treatment of the patient and prohibits a pharmacist from refusing to dispense a drug for unapproved use if a valid prescription is presented.
Title
Prescriptions; unapproved use.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102844D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2971.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |