VA HB965 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Community service work in lieu of payment of fines and costs. Provides that a court may permit an inmate to earn credits against any fines and court costs imposed against him by performing community service. Under current law, credits may be earned only before or after imprisonment.
Title
Court fines and costs; community service work in lieu of payment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB277-Price) by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103389D |
Same As/Similar To
HB277 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB965 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB965+hil |