VA HB965 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's Child Safety Test. Permits each local school board to include as part of the program of physical fitness made available to all students the Governor's Child Safety Test, a program of instruction that will consist of at least eight hours of instruction per year on how to recognize, avoid, resist, and escape physical, sexual, and online threats and will result in a certificate signed by the Governor upon successful completion of the program.
Title
Governor's Child Safety Test; local school board to include as part of program of physical fitness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-07 | House | Continued to 2015 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2014-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Public Safety Subcommittee by voice vote |
2014-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104334D-H1 |
2014-01-27 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101856D |