VA HB963 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act; penalty. Creates the Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act (the Act). The Act prohibits an abortion after 20 weeks gestation unless, in reasonable medical judgment, the mother has a condition that so complicates her medical condition as to necessitate the abortion to avert her death or to avert serious risk of substantial and irreversible physical impairment of a major bodily function. When an abortion is not prohibited post-20 weeks' gestation, the physician is required to terminate the pregnancy in a manner that would provide the unborn child the best opportunity to survive. The bill punishes performance of an abortion in violation of the Act as a Class 4 felony. The bill also provides for civil remedies against a physician who performs an abortion in violation of the Act.
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act; created, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-12 | House | Continued to 2017 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Constitutional Law |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103827D |