VA HB961 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0526)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0526)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Shoplifting and employee theft; civil action. Provides that a civil action for shoplifting or employee theft may be initiated or maintained by a merchant even though a criminal action for the same conduct has been initiated; however, such civil action may not be initiated during the pendency of a criminal prosecution based on the same allegations of fact. A merchant may not recover more than the value of the merchandise, or more than the unpaid retail value of the merchandise if it is not recovered in a merchantable condition, for the same loss if both criminal and civil actions are initiated. However, a merchant may still recover any damages in excess of such value allowed by statute even if a criminal action is initiated.
Title
Shoplifting and employee theft; merchant allowed to recover damages under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0526) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 526 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB961ER) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105466D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House | |
2012-02-24 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105466D-S1 (96-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB961S1 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105466D-S1 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105466D-S1 | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB961H1 | |
2012-02-02 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104805D-H1 | |
2012-02-02 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-01 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-30 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104805D-H1 | |
2012-01-30 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102294D |