VA HB961 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Community College Scholarship Match Program. Establishes the Community College Scholarship Match Program to provide matching funds to community college foundations and the Virginia Foundation for Community College Education. Funds paid shall not exceed $5 million in any fiscal year. These funds shall be used to award scholarships to students who (i) are domiciled residents of Virginia and (ii) are enrolled in an associate degree program in a Virginia community college studying science, technology, engineering, math, education, or nursing.
Title
Community College Scholarship Match Program; created.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Carrico [R] | Del. Benjamin Cline [R] | Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R] | Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] |
Del. John O'Bannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Education | |
2010-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102557D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB961 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB961+hil |