VA HB952 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia African Diaspora Advisory Board. Establishes the Virginia African Diaspora Advisory Board to advise the Governor on ways to improve economic and cultural links between the Commonwealth and African nations, with a focus on the areas of commerce and trade, agriculture, art, education, and government. The Board is composed of 18 nonlegislative citizen members, of whom at least 15 must be persons who identify as part of the African diaspora, to be appointed by the Governor. The Secretaries of Agriculture and Forestry, Commerce and Trade, and Education or their designees serve as ex officio members. Virginia African Diaspora Advisory Board. Establishes the Virginia African Diaspora Advisory Board to advise the Governor on ways to improve economic and cultural links between the Commonwealth and African nations, with a focus on the areas of commerce and trade, agriculture, art, education, and government. The Board is composed of 18 nonlegislative citizen members, of whom at least 15 must be persons who identify as part of the African diaspora, to be appointed by the Governor. The Secretaries of Agriculture and Forestry, Commerce and Trade, and Education or their designees serve as ex officio members.
Title
Virginia African Diaspora Advisory Board; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101838D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2499.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2499.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |