VA HB934 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Medical and mental health treatment of prisoners incapable of giving consent. Establishes a process for the sheriff or administrator in charge of a local or regional correctional facility to petition a court to authorize medical or mental health treatment for a prisoner in such facility who is incapable of giving informed consent for such treatment. The process parallels the existing process for the Director of the Department of Corrections to seek authorization to provide involuntary treatment to prisoners in state correctional facilities. The bill provides that the treatment ordered may be provided within a local or regional correctional facility if such facility is licensed to provide such treatment. If statutory procedures are followed, the service provider does not have liability based on lack of consent or lack of capacity to consent unless there is injury or death resulting from gross negligence or willful and wanton misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisoners; medical and mental health treatment of those incapable of giving consent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseFailed to pass
2018-03-10HouseNo further action taken
2018-03-08SenateSenators: Dunnavant, Newman, Barker
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-08HouseDelegates: Hope, Habeeb, Campbell
2018-03-08HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-08HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N 1-A)
2018-03-06HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107816D-S1 (0-Y 94-N 1-A)
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB934S1
2018-03-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107816D-S1
2018-03-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-05SenateCommittee amendments rejected
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107816D-S1
2018-02-28SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-16SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
2018-02-12SenateRereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
2018-02-12SenateRereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-02HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 18102531D-E
2018-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB934E
2018-02-01HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-01HouseRead second time
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102531D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171406(n/a)See Bill Text
171410(n/a)See Bill Text
372803(n/a)See Bill Text
531133.04(n/a)See Bill Text
531133.05(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB934
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB934+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB934E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB934S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0802V0038+HB0934
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0023+HB0934
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0297+HB0934
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0295+HB0934
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S09V0076+HB0934
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0373+HB0934
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0829HB0934+HB0934
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0898HB0934+HB0934
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1370+HB0934
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1008HB0934+HB0934

Bill Comments

feedback