VA HB928 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1042)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1042)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Chesterfield County School Board; recovery high school. Permits the Chesterfield County School Board to establish a recovery high school in the school division as a year-round high school (i) for which enrollment is open to any high school student who resides in Superintendent's Region 1 and is in the early stages of recovery from substance use disorder or dependency and (ii) for the purpose of providing such students with the academic, emotional, and social support necessary to make progress toward earning a high school diploma and reintegrating into a traditional high school setting.
Title
Chesterfield County School Board; recovery high school to be established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 94-N) (Y: 3 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 0-N (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 94-N) (Y: 3 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 0-N (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1042) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1042 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB928ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Hashmi, Lewis, Locke |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Delegates: Coyner, Adams, D.M., Aird |
2020-03-04 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-04 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 94-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (3-Y 94-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 0-N |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 20102463D-E |
2020-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB928E |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102463D |