VA HB928 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0846)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0846)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Universities Clean Energy Development and Economic Stimulus Foundation. Creates the Virginia Universities Clean Energy Development and Economic Stimulus Foundation as a body corporate and a political subdivision of the Commonwealth. The Foundation shall identify, obtain, disburse, and administer funding for (i) research and development of alternative fuels, clean energy production, and related technologies; (ii) support of economic development projects in disadvantaged rural areas; and (iii) the provision of assistance in the commercialization of alternative fuels and clean energy technologies. Funding shall be awarded only to those proposed projects that best meet the established criteria and purposes of this act.
Title
Virginia Universities Clean Energy Development and Economic Stimulus Foundation; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0846) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 846 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB928ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-13 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-13 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB928ER) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Higher Education | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Printed as engrossed 10102967D-E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB928E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102967D |