VA HB927 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; voting systems; reporting absentee results by precinct. Includes in the definition of "voting system" on-demand ballot printing systems and ballot marking devices used to manufacture or mark ballots to be cast by voters on electronic voting and counting machines. The bill also requires general registrars to report to the Department of Elections the number and results of absentee ballots cast by voters assigned to each precinct in the registrar's locality. The Department is directed by the bill to establish standards for ascertaining and reporting such information.
Title
Voting systems; reporting absentee results by precinct, definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125) | |
2022-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 125 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB927ER) |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22107263D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB927S1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107263D-S1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107263D-S1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-04 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101352D |
Same As/Similar To
SB3 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0126)
SB3 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0126)
SB3 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0126)