VA HB926 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Posting human trafficking hotline information; basic health care services facilities; civil penalty. Provides that any employer who operates a facility in which basic health care services are provided and fails to post notice of the existence of a human trafficking hotline to alert possible witnesses or victims of human trafficking to the availability of a means to report crimes or gain assistance is subject to a civil penalty of $100 per facility in which the notice is not posted.
Title
Human trafficking hotline; basic health care services facilities, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104603D |